Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0379)
Title
Health Occupation – Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 (SB0431)
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651 (SB0464)
Title
Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 (SB0556)
Title
Collective Bargaining - Teachers at the Maryland School for the Deaf - Separate Bargaining Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0910
Title
Health Insurance – Hearing Aids for Adults – Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 (HB0535)
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 (HB0651)
Title
Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB0837)
Title
Collective Bargaining - Maryland School for the Deaf - Application and Separate Bargaining Unit
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0631
Title
Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 (SB0379) Health Occupation – Licensing of Audiology Assistants Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0535 (SB0431) Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0651 (SB0464) Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/05/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0837 (SB0556) Collective Bargaining - Teachers at the Maryland School for the Deaf - Separate Bargaining Unit Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0910 Health Insurance – Hearing Aids for Adults – Coverage Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0431 (HB0535) Maryland Sign Language Interpreter Act Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0464 (HB0651) Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0556 (HB0837) Collective Bargaining - Maryland School for the Deaf - Application and Separate Bargaining Unit Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0631 Workgroup to Study and Implement a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:18 PM
Click to return on the top page