Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0037 (SB0370)
Title
Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 /CH0400 (SB0103/CH0399)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0374 (SB0955)
Title
Maryland School for the Deaf - Professional Personnel and Staff - Service Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0466
Title
Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 (SB0617/CH0215)
Title
Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0612
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Responsibilities and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0743 (SB0410)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0749)
Title
Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1107 (SB0748)
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreters Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238
Title
Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103 /CH0399 (HB0155/CH0400)
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177
Title
Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 (HB0037)
Title
Education - Educational Interpreter - Certification Requirements
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 (HB0743)
Title
Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0617 /CH0215 (HB0547)
Title
Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 (HB1107)
Title
Maryland Sign Language Interpreters Act
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 (HB1003)
Title
Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955 (HB0374)
Title
Maryland School for the Deaf – Professional Personnel and Staff – Service Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0037 (SB0370) Education – Educational Interpreter – Certification Requirements Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0155 /CH0400 (SB0103/CH0399) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech-Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists - Revisions Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 400
Health and Government Operations
1/20/2022 - 4:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0374 (SB0955) Maryland School for the Deaf - Professional Personnel and Staff - Service Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0466 Income Tax - Personal Exemption - Disabled Individuals Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 (SB0617/CH0215) Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education) Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0612 Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Responsibilities and Reporting Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0743 (SB0410) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Delegate Lierman 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1003 (SB0749) Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1107 (SB0748) Maryland Sign Language Interpreters Act Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1238 Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0103 /CH0399 (HB0155/CH0400) State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, Speech–Language Pathologists, and Music Therapists – Revisions Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0177 Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Payments to Former Employees of Bethlehem Steel Corporation Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 (HB0037) Education - Educational Interpreter - Certification Requirements Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0410 (HB0743) Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Reemployment Senator Elfreth 6 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2022 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0617 /CH0215 (HB0547) Local School Systems - Equivalent Access Standards - Digital Tools (Equivalent and Nonvisual Access Accountability Act for K-12 Education) Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0748 (HB1107) Maryland Sign Language Interpreters Act Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 (HB1003) Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0955 (HB0374) Maryland School for the Deaf – Professional Personnel and Staff – Service Designation, Assignment, and Placement in a Collective Bargaining Unit Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:44 PM
Click to return on the top page