Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Deaf Persons

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 (SB0185)
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0195 /CH0739 (SB0817)
Title
Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426 /CH0361 (SB0092/CH0360)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 /CH0282 (SB0843/CH0283)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Hearing Loss
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0744 (SB0689)
Title
Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Rental Property - Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069 /CH0443 (SB1084/CH0442)
Title
Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141 (SB1068/CH0450)
Title
Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 (SB1096)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Identification of Nonapparent Disability
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092 /CH0360 (HB0426/CH0361)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0185 (HB0098)
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 (HB0823/CH0744)
Title
Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB0195/CH0739)
Title
Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 /CH0283 (HB0669/CH0282)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Hearing Loss
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1068 /CH0450 (HB1141)
Title
Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1084 /CH0442 (HB1069/CH0443)
Title
Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1096 (HB1456)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Identification of Nonapparent Disability
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0098 (SB0185) Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0195 /CH0739 (SB0817) Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 739
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0426 /CH0361 (SB0092/CH0360) Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning Delegate Bhandari 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Economic Matters
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0669 /CH0282 (SB0843/CH0283) Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Hearing Loss Delegate Pruski 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Economic Matters
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0823 /CH0744 (SB0689) Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Rental Property - Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 744
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1069 /CH0443 (SB1084/CH0442) Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established Delegate Kaufman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2024 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1141 (SB1068/CH0450) Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Energy, and the Environment
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2024 - 2:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1456 (SB1096) Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Identification of Nonapparent Disability Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0092 /CH0360 (HB0426/CH0361) Places of Public Accommodation - Motion Picture Houses - Captioning Senator Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0185 (HB0098) Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/30/2024 - 3:00 PM
SB0689 (HB0823/CH0744) Fire Protection and Prevention – Residential Rental Property – Requirements (Melanie Nicholle Diaz Fire Safety Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0817 (HB0195/CH0739) Public Safety - Missing Persons - Purple Alert Program Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0843 /CH0283 (HB0669/CH0282) Workers' Compensation - Benefits - Hearing Loss Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Finance
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1068 /CH0450 (HB1141) Department of Information Technology - Evaluation and Development of a 3-1-1 Portal Using Artificial Intelligence Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1084 /CH0442 (HB1069/CH0443) Workgroup for the Deaf, Deafblind, and Hard of Hearing - Established Senator Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB1096 (HB1456) Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Identification of Nonapparent Disability Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:38 PM
Click to return on the top page