Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175
Title
Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 (SB0624)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 (HB0638)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 Public Safety - Ammunition - Sales and Transfers Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0638 (SB0624) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1019 Sales and Use Tax - Vendor Collection Credit Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1291 Public Safety - Untraceable Firearms Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0624 (HB0638) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0852 Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 6:03 PM
Click to return on the top page