Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0038 /CH0460
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0732)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 /CH0618
Title
Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority – Program for Payment of Unpaid Video Tolls
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236
Title
Comptroller – Withholding of Income Tax Refunds – Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0624 (SB0101/CH0625)
Title
Election Law - Contested Elections
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 /CH0555
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass - Disputes of Charges and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Rental Assistance Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0451 (SB0542)
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Grants – Prompt Payment Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582 (SB0059/CH0448)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Options for the Payment of Tolls and Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0584
Title
Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0587 (SB0573)
Title
Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0650
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932 /CH0671 (SB0592/CH0672)
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Right to Redemption of Leased Premises – Form of Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059 /CH0448 (HB0582)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0625 (HB0291/CH0624)
Title
Election Law - Contested Elections
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0542 (HB0451)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB0587)
Title
Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0672 (HB0932/CH0671)
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Right to Redemption of Leased Premises – Form of Payment
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0111)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0038 /CH0460 Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Tolls - Collection Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0111 (SB0732) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0128 /CH0618 Debt Settlement Services – Student Education Loan Debt Relief – Disclosures and Prohibitions Delegate Lopez 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Economic Matters
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0175 Maryland Transportation Authority – Program for Payment of Unpaid Video Tolls Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0236 Comptroller – Withholding of Income Tax Refunds – Prohibition Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0291 /CH0624 (SB0101/CH0625) Election Law - Contested Elections Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 624
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0322 Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 /CH0555 Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass - Disputes of Charges and Fees Delegate Foley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0367 Landlord and Tenant – Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent – Rental Assistance Programs Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0451 (SB0542) State Finance and Procurement – Grants – Prompt Payment Requirement Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0582 (SB0059/CH0448) Maryland Transportation Authority - Options for the Payment of Tolls and Civil Penalties Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0584 Video Lottery Operator - Reconciliation of Proceeds - Uncollectible Debt Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0587 (SB0573) Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0650 Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearage - Workers' Compensation Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0932 /CH0671 (SB0592/CH0672) Landlord and Tenant – Right to Redemption of Leased Premises – Form of Payment Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 671
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0059 /CH0448 (HB0582) Maryland Transportation Authority - Tolls - Civil Penalties Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2022 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0101 /CH0625 (HB0291/CH0624) Election Law - Contested Elections Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 625
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
SB0152 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Transcript Requests by Students With Unpaid Student Account Balances Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
SB0542 (HB0451) State Finance and Procurement - Grants - Prompt Payment Requirement Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0573 (HB0587) Motor Vehicle Financial Protection Product Agreements Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0592 /CH0672 (HB0932/CH0671) Landlord and Tenant – Right to Redemption of Leased Premises – Form of Payment Senator Lee 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 672
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0732 (HB0111) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/27/2022 8:31 AM
Click to return on the top page