Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Debt Collection -see also- Attachments and Garnishments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 (SB0165)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0384 (SB0248)
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Transcripts - Prohibition on Punitive Measures Related to Student Debt
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0476
Title
Consumer Protection - Debt Collectors - Debtors With Multiple Debts
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522
Title
Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Institutional Debt - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0686
Title
Financial Regulation - Modernizing Licensing of Non-Depository Institutions and Elimination of Branch License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0071)
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Phillips
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0913
Title
Financial Institutions - Student Financing Companies - Required Registration and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0071 (HB0800)
Title
Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0050)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan – Required Documents
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0384)
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Transcripts - Prohibition on Punitive Measures Related to Student Debt
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513
Title
Environment – Collection and Reporting of Drinking Water and Wastewater Data and Information – Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 (SB0165) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/24/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0384 (SB0248) Institutions of Higher Education - Transcripts - Prohibition on Punitive Measures Related to Student Debt Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Appropriations
2/14/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0476 Consumer Protection - Debt Collectors - Debtors With Multiple Debts Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0522 Institutions of Postsecondary Education - Institutional Debt - Report Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0686 Financial Regulation - Modernizing Licensing of Non-Depository Institutions and Elimination of Branch License Requirements Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0800 (SB0071) Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation Delegate Phillips 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0913 Financial Institutions - Student Financing Companies - Required Registration and Reporting Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0071 (HB0800) Execution on a Judgment - Child Support Arrearages - Workers' Compensation Senator Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 (HB0050) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan – Required Documents Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0248 (HB0384) Institutions of Higher Education - Transcripts - Prohibition on Punitive Measures Related to Student Debt Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 Environment – Collection and Reporting of Drinking Water and Wastewater Data and Information – Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/23/2023 4:00 PM
Click to return on the top page