Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Debt Management

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB0439/CH0138)
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0382
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0251 /CH0101
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 /CH0138 (HB0125)
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act)
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937
Title
Housing and Community Development – Mortgage, Down Payment, and Settlement Expense Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 (SB0439/CH0138) Public Institutions of Higher Education – Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0852 /CH0382 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0251 /CH0101 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Licensing of Nondepository Institutions - Elimination of Paper License Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Finance
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0439 /CH0138 (HB0125) Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Athletes (Jordan McNair Safe and Fair Play Act) Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0937 Housing and Community Development – Mortgage, Down Payment, and Settlement Expense Assistance Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:23 AM
Click to return on the top page