Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Deeds

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160
Title
Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 (SB0698)
Title
Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0724)
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0781)
Title
Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0457)
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Homestead and Homeowners' Property Tax Credits - Access and Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Notice Requirements and Application Waiver for First-Time Homebuyers
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB1196)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 (HB0938)
Title
Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 (HB1009)
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 (HB1095)
Title
Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0160 Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0938 (SB0698) Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1009 (SB0724) Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1095 (SB0781) Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1196 (SB0457) Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgage Loans Act - Revisions Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1255 Homestead and Homeowners' Property Tax Credits - Access and Eligibility Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 Homestead Property Tax Credit - Notice Requirements and Application Waiver for First-Time Homebuyers Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0457 (HB1196) Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 (HB0938) Real Property Transfer–on–Death Deed Task Force Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0724 (HB1009) Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0781 (HB1095) Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page