Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Defendants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0141
Title
Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases
Sponsor
Delegate Pippy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310 (SB0044)
Title
Safe Communities Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0568)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 (SB0354)
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Harris
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0432
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings and Criminal Procedure - Technical Corrections - References to Intellectual Disability
Sponsor
Delegate Kaufman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0555
Title
Criminal Law - Unauthorized Dissemination of Personal Identifying Information - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0614 (SB0468)
Title
Criminal Law – Private Home Detention Monitoring – Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978
Title
Courts - Maryland Judicial Public Text Messaging System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1062
Title
Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346
Title
Competency Evaluations and Commitment Orders - Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1429 (SB0662)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Protecting the Admissibility of Creative Expression (PACE Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470 (SB0449)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Incompetency to Stand Trial Dismissal
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 (HB0310)
Title
Safe Communities Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0372)
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 (HB1470)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Incompetency to Stand Trial Dismissal
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0468 (HB0614)
Title
Criminal Law - Private Home Detention Monitoring - Notification
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554
Title
Criminal Procedure - Not Criminally Responsible Verdict - Term of Commitment
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0330)
Title
Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB1429)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Admissibility of Creative Expression
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0087 Criminal Law - Death Penalty Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0141 Criminal Procedure - Child Victims - Testimony in Child Abuse Cases Delegate Pippy 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/25/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0310 (SB0044) Safe Communities Act of 2024 Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0330 (SB0568) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
HB0372 (SB0354) Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program Delegate Harris 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0432 Courts and Judicial Proceedings and Criminal Procedure - Technical Corrections - References to Intellectual Disability Delegate Kaufman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0555 Criminal Law - Unauthorized Dissemination of Personal Identifying Information - Prohibition Delegate Johnson, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0614 (SB0468) Criminal Law – Private Home Detention Monitoring – Notification Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0978 Courts - Maryland Judicial Public Text Messaging System - Report Delegate Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1062 Deep Fake Representations and Revenge Porn Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted
Judiciary
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 Competency Evaluations and Commitment Orders - Modification Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1429 (SB0662) Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Protecting the Admissibility of Creative Expression (PACE Act) Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1470 (SB0449) Criminal Procedure - Incompetency to Stand Trial Dismissal Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judiciary
SB0044 (HB0310) Safe Communities Act of 2024 Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0372) Montgomery County and Prince George's County - Rent Court Workforce Solutions Pilot Program Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0449 (HB1470) Criminal Procedure – Incompetency to Stand Trial Dismissal Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0468 (HB0614) Criminal Law - Private Home Detention Monitoring - Notification Senator McCray 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 Criminal Procedure - Not Criminally Responsible Verdict - Term of Commitment Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0568 (HB0330) Courts - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 (HB1429) Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Admissibility of Creative Expression Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0872 Criminal Law - Animal Abuse or Neglect - Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page