Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Dental Hygienists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 /CH0106 (SB0825)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Administration of Nitrous Oxide
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680 /CH0111 (SB0460)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Local Anesthesia
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0830 (SB0538)
Title
Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists (Oral Health Access for Underserved Marylanders Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283 (SB0228)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1468
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0042 /CH0528
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Appointment of Dentist and Dental Hygienist Members - Advice and Consent of the Senate
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 (HB1283)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0680/CH0111)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Local Anesthesia
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0538 (HB0830)
Title
Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB0470/CH0106)
Title
Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Administration of Nitrous Oxide
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1082
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0470 /CH0106 (SB0825) Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Administration of Nitrous Oxide Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0680 /CH0111 (SB0460) Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Local Anesthesia Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0830 (SB0538) Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists (Oral Health Access for Underserved Marylanders Act) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1283 (SB0228) State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate Oaks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1468 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0042 /CH0528 State Board of Dental Examiners - Appointment of Dentist and Dental Hygienist Members - Advice and Consent of the Senate Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 (HB1283) State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 (HB0680/CH0111) Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Local Anesthesia Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0538 (HB0830) Dental Hygienists - Scope of Practice - Authority to Practice Under General Supervision of Licensed Dentists Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0825 (HB0470/CH0106) Health Occupations - Dental Hygienists - Administration of Nitrous Oxide Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1082 State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, and Operation of a Dental Practice Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page