Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Dental Hygienists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 (SB0371)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0399
Title
Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 (HB0470)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0470 (SB0371) State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0738 /CH0399 Dental Hygienist – Scope of Practice – Practice Settings Under General Supervision Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 (HB0470) State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice Senator West 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page