Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dental Hygienists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219 /CH0677 (SB0306/CH0678)
Title
Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0309 (SB0611/CH0310)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 /CH0678 (HB0219/CH0677)
Title
Dental Hygienists - Consultation Requirements - Health Care Practitioners
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0611 /CH0310 (HB0969/CH0309)
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0219 /CH0677 (SB0306/CH0678) Dental Hygienists – Consultation Requirements – Health Care Practitioners Delegate Kelly 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0969 /CH0309 (SB0611/CH0310) State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0306 /CH0678 (HB0219/CH0677) Dental Hygienists - Consultation Requirements - Health Care Practitioners Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0611 /CH0310 (HB0969/CH0309) State Board of Dental Examiners - Training and Disciplinary Processes - Revisions Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:21 PM
Click to return on the top page