Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Dentists

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 (SB0100)
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547 (SB0485)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0708
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dispositions and Summary Suspensions - Time Periods
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0710 (SB0465)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0731 (SB0567)
Title
Telehealth Services – Expansion
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 (SB0758)
Title
Health Insurance - Incentive Arrangements - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners – Membership – Nomination and Appointment Process
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 (HB0368)
Title
Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 (HB0710)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0547)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 (HB0731)
Title
Telehealth Services - Expansion
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 (HB1021)
Title
Health Insurance - Incentive Arrangements - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0777 (HB1349)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0808
Title
Health Occupations – Licensed Dentists – Administration of Vaccines
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0923
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Eligibility
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0368 (SB0100) Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/19/2021 - 2:00 PM
Finance
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0547 (SB0485) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0581 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0708 State Board of Dental Examiners - Dispositions and Summary Suspensions - Time Periods Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0710 (SB0465) Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0731 (SB0567) Telehealth Services – Expansion Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1021 (SB0758) Health Insurance - Incentive Arrangements - Authorization Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
HB1030 State Board of Dental Examiners – Membership – Nomination and Appointment Process Delegate Saab 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules
SB0100 (HB0368) Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0465 (HB0710) Maryland Medical Assistance Programs - Dental Providers and Dental Students - Reimbursement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0485 (HB0547) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Dental Prophylaxis Care and Oral Health Exams Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0486 (HB0581) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 (HB0731) Telehealth Services - Expansion President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 (HB1021) Health Insurance - Incentive Arrangements - Authorization Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0777 (HB1349) Public Health - Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Grant Program Fund Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0808 Health Occupations – Licensed Dentists – Administration of Vaccines Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Task Force Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0923 Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Eligibility Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 3:59 PM
Click to return on the top page