Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Dependents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056 (SB0473)
Title
Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0143 (SB0218/CH0040)
Title
Maryland Child Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0375 (SB0211)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406
Title
Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Retiree Health Benefits - Mandatory Retirement
Sponsor
Health and Government Operations Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0816
Title
Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0375)
Title
Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 /CH0040 (HB0143)
Title
Income Tax - Child Tax Credit and Expansion of the Earned Income Credit
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 (HB0056)
Title
Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 (SB0473) Labor and Employment – Leave With Pay – Bereavement Leave Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0143 (SB0218/CH0040) Maryland Child Tax Credit Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0375 (SB0211) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0406 Higher Education - Nonresident Tuition - Exemption for Spouses and Dependents of Honorably Discharged Veterans Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0607 Judges' Retirement System - Retiree Health Benefits - Mandatory Retirement Health and Government Operations Committee 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0816 Family Law - Support of Destitute Adult Children - Repeal Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1335 State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0211 (HB0375) Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021) Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0218 /CH0040 (HB0143) Income Tax - Child Tax Credit and Expansion of the Earned Income Credit Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 40
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0473 (HB0056) Labor and Employment - Leave With Pay - Bereavement Leave Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:20 PM
Click to return on the top page