Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dependents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0253 /CH0652 (SB0655/CH0653)
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277 /CH0065 (SB0234/CH0066)
Title
Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Burial in State Veterans' Cemeteries - Spouses and Dependents
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1294
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department - Employees and Dependents
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0066 (HB0277/CH0065)
Title
Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652
Title
Higher Education - Edward T. Conroy and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program - Expansion (Officer Keona Holley Public Safety Act)
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0655 /CH0653 (HB0253/CH0652)
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Federal Extended Benefits for Long-Term Unemployment
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949
Title
Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0253 /CH0652 (SB0655/CH0653) Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Economic Matters
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0277 /CH0065 (SB0234/CH0066) Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment Delegate Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 65
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1251 Department of Veterans Affairs - Burial in State Veterans' Cemeteries - Spouses and Dependents Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1294 State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - BWI Airport Fire and Rescue Department - Employees and Dependents Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 /CH0066 (HB0277/CH0065) Public Schools - Purple Star Schools Program - Establishment Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Division of Correction - Data Requirement Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 Higher Education - Edward T. Conroy and Mary A. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program and Jean B. Cryor Memorial Scholarship Program - Expansion (Officer Keona Holley Public Safety Act) Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Smith)
Judicial Proceedings
SB0655 /CH0653 (HB0253/CH0652) Unemployment Insurance - Federal Extended Benefits for Long-Term Unemployment Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0949 Scholarships and Police Officer Recruitment Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:23 PM
Click to return on the top page