Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Development Fees and Taxes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 (SB0572)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Development Impact Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Pruski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 /CH0186 (SB0814/CH0187)
Title
Local Government - Development Impact Fees, Surcharges, and Excise Taxes - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1466 /CH0197 (SB0891/CH0196)
Title
Land Use and Real Property - Accessory Dwelling Units - Requirements and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0572 (HB0453)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Development Impact Fees
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 /CH0187 (HB0698/CH0186)
Title
Local Government - Development Impact Fees, Surcharges, and Excise Taxes - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 /CH0196 (HB1466/CH0197)
Title
Land Use and Real Property - Accessory Dwelling Units - Requirements and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0453 (SB0572) Anne Arundel County - Development Impact Fees Delegate Pruski 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0698 /CH0186 (SB0814/CH0187) Local Government - Development Impact Fees, Surcharges, and Excise Taxes - Reporting Delegate Allen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 186
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1466 /CH0197 (SB0891/CH0196) Land Use and Real Property - Accessory Dwelling Units - Requirements and Prohibitions Delegate Stewart 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0572 (HB0453) Anne Arundel County - Development Impact Fees Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2025 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 /CH0187 (HB0698/CH0186) Local Government - Development Impact Fees, Surcharges, and Excise Taxes - Reporting Senator Watson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 /CH0196 (HB1466/CH0197) Land Use and Real Property - Accessory Dwelling Units - Requirements and Prohibitions Senator Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/24/2025 10:41 AM
Click to return on the top page