Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Disabilities, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0048 /CH0605 (SB1066/CH0343)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 /CH0657
Title
Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0178
Title
Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1066 /CH0343 (HB0048/CH0605)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0048 /CH0605 (SB1066/CH0343) Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0957 /CH0657 Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0178 Department of Aging - Aging and Disability Resource Center Program - Maryland Access Point Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
1/17/2013 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1066 /CH0343 (HB0048/CH0605) Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit Entities Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM
Click to return on the top page