Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Disabilities, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0039 (SB0355)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0685
Title
Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 /CH0331 (HB0593/CH0332)
Title
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0038
Title
Department of Disabilities - Assistive Technology Loan Program - Board of Directors
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 (HB0431/CH0039)
Title
Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0431 /CH0039 (SB0355) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment Delegate Bromwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0685 Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging Population Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 /CH0331 (HB0593/CH0332) Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - Membership Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 /CH0038 Department of Disabilities - Assistive Technology Loan Program - Board of Directors Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 (HB0431/CH0039) Maryland Achieving a Better Life Experience (ABLE) Program - Establishment Senator Feldman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page