Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Disabilities, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 /CH0749 (SB0052/CH0750)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 /CH0389
Title
State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Location and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0989 /CH0378 (SB0714/CH0379)
Title
Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 /CH0750 (HB0078/CH0749)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 (HB0879)
Title
Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 /CH0379 (HB0989/CH0378)
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 /CH0749 (SB0052/CH0750) Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 749
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0718 /CH0389 State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs - Location and Funding Delegate Guyton 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 389
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0989 /CH0378 (SB0714/CH0379) Public Safety – 9–1–1 Emergency Telephone System – Alterations Delegate Krebs 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0052 /CH0750 (HB0078/CH0749) Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Senator Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 750
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0069 (HB0879) Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0714 /CH0379 (HB0989/CH0378) Public Safety - 9-1-1 Emergency Telephone System - Alterations Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 379
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page