Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Diseases -see also- AIDS; COVID-19; Pandemics; Rabies

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Comprehensive Health Education Framework - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1145 (SB0844)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 /CH0232 (HB0076/CH0231)
Title
Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0161
Title
Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0923 (HB0084/CH0922)
Title
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 (HB1145)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0558 Primary and Secondary Education - Comprehensive Health Education Framework - Established Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1145 (SB0844) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 /CH0232 (HB0076/CH0231) Health Occupations - Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccines Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 232
Finance
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 /CH0161 Department of Aging - Caregiver Expense Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Budget and Taxation
1/17/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0332 /CH0923 (HB0084/CH0922) Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law) Senator Lewis Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 923
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0844 (HB1145) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - Hypertension Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page