Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

District of Columbia

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118
Title
Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915
Title
Motor Vehicles - Out-of-State Drivers - Automated Enforcement (Out-of-State Driver Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
Education - Reporting Arrests of Students - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Long, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 Interstate Teacher Mobility Compact Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0915 Motor Vehicles - Out-of-State Drivers - Automated Enforcement (Out-of-State Driver Accountability Act) Delegate Foley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 Education - Reporting Arrests of Students - Alterations Delegate Long, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:15 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/05/2025 - 1:15 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/19/2025 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page