Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Dogs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0081 (SB0122)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 (SB0007)
Title
Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0234 (SB0607)
Title
Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 (SB0200)
Title
Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0284)
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0713 (SB0409)
Title
County Boards of Education - Therapy Dogs - Policy for Handling and Use in Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0007 (HB0186)
Title
Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0103
Title
Domestic Animals - Retail Pet Stores and the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 (HB0081)
Title
Crimes – Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 /CH0090
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 (HB0293)
Title
Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 (HB0660)
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 (HB0713)
Title
County Boards of Education – Therapy Dogs – Policy for Handling and Use in Schools
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0545
Title
Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0607 (HB0234)
Title
Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0081 (SB0122) Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0186 (SB0007) Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0234 (SB0607) Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0293 (SB0200) Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0660 (SB0284) Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0713 (SB0409) County Boards of Education - Therapy Dogs - Policy for Handling and Use in Schools Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0007 (HB0186) Courts - Court Dog Program - Veterans Treatment Courts Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0103 Domestic Animals - Retail Pet Stores and the Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities and Sourcing Standards Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/05/2021 - 5:00 PM
SB0122 (HB0081) Crimes – Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/20/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0156 /CH0090 Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0200 (HB0293) Natural Resources - Organized Killing Contests - Restriction Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0284 (HB0660) Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0409 (HB0713) County Boards of Education – Therapy Dogs – Policy for Handling and Use in Schools Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0545 Task Force to Study Canine Breeding Facilities Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0607 (HB0234) Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:19 PM
Click to return on the top page