Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dogs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 /CH0181 (SB0044/CH0182)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0776 (SB0070)
Title
Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064 (SB0816)
Title
Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1375 (SB0815)
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages (Buddy's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038 /CH0185
Title
Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 /CH0182 (HB0016/CH0181)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0070 (HB0776)
Title
Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815 (HB1375)
Title
Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816 (HB1064)
Title
Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 /CH0181 (SB0044/CH0182) Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat Delegate Lehman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0776 (SB0070) Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0965 Civil Actions - Tortious Injury or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1064 (SB0816) Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1375 (SB0815) Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages (Buddy's Law) Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 /CH0185 Public Safety - Fire and Rescue - Veterinary Care of Retired Fire and Rescue K-9s Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 /CH0182 (HB0016/CH0181) Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0070 (HB0776) Emergency Medical System Plan - Guidelines for Emergency Medical Services - Law Enforcement Canines Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0815 (HB1375) Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Damages Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 (HB1064) Real Property - Actions for Possession - Pet Protections Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:22 AM
Click to return on the top page