Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Domestic Partnerships and Civil Unions

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 (SB0286)
Title
Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Married Couples and Registered Domestic Partnerships
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0286 (HB0323)
Title
Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Jackson, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0323 (SB0286) Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/06/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0928 Estates and Trusts - Wills - Married Couples and Registered Domestic Partnerships Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/05/2025 - 3:00 PM
SB0286 (HB0323) Domestic Partnership and Marriage - Required Information Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2025 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0330 Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Alterations Senator Jackson, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2025 - 10:30 AM
Ways and Means
3/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/2/2025 4:55 PM
Click to return on the top page