Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0037)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186 (SB0148)
Title
Victim Services Programs – Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0224 (SB0272)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0267 (SB0383)
Title
Family Law - Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0285 (SB0013)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Domestic Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 (SB0191)
Title
Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Labor Organizations PG 308-23
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630
Title
Utility Account Holders - Victims of Abuse - Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Baltimore City Sheriff – Staffing
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Task Force to Study Murder Prevention and Reduction in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073
Title
Homeowner Assistance Fund – Victims of Domestic Violence – Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Taveras
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013 (HB0285)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0097)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods (REDEEM Act of 2023)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040
Title
Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0186)
Title
Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act)
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB0433)
Title
Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Duties and Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272 (HB0224)
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 (HB0267)
Title
Family Law - Custody and Visitation - Notice of Intent to Travel (Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act)
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430
Title
State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486
Title
Baltimore City Sheriff – Staffing
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754
Title
Maryland Wiretap and Electronic Surveillance Reform Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 (SB0037) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0186 (SB0148) Victim Services Programs – Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act) Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/31/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Budget and Taxation
Judicial Proceedings
HB0224 (SB0272) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0267 (SB0383) Family Law - Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0285 (SB0013) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0324 Child Abuse and Neglect - Domestic Violence Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0433 (SB0191) Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Deputy Sheriffs and Labor Organizations PG 308-23 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0630 Utility Account Holders - Victims of Abuse - Protections Delegate Queen 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0632 Baltimore City Sheriff – Staffing Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1030 Task Force to Study Murder Prevention and Reduction in Maryland Delegate Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1073 Homeowner Assistance Fund – Victims of Domestic Violence – Eligibility Delegate Taveras 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1251 Criminal Procedure - Sentencing - Primary Caretaker Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0013 (HB0285) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0037 (HB0097) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods (REDEEM Act of 2023) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 (HB0186) Victim Services Programs - Supplementing Federal Funding and Support (Victim Services Stabilization Act) Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
1/25/2023 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
3/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0191 (HB0433) Prince George's County - Office of the Sheriff - Duties and Deputy Sheriffs Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0272 (HB0224) State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0383 (HB0267) Family Law - Custody and Visitation - Notice of Intent to Travel (Maryland Child Abduction Prevention Act) Senator McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0430 State Lottery – Instant Ticket Lottery Machines – Fraternal Organizations (ITLMs for Homeless Veterans Act) Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0486 Baltimore City Sheriff – Staffing Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 Maryland Wiretap and Electronic Surveillance Reform Workgroup Senator Folden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/31/2023 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page