Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dorchester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 /CH0387 (SB0080/CH0388)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 (SB0018)
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 /CH0444 (SB0342)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB0664)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 (SB0988/CH0386)
Title
Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 (HB0199)
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0080 /CH0388 (HB0193/CH0387)
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 (HB0556/CH0444)
Title
Caroline County and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1144)
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0988 /CH0386 (HB1456)
Title
Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0193 /CH0387 (SB0080/CH0388) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 387
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0199 (SB0018) Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc. Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0556 /CH0444 (SB0342) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB0664) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1456 (SB0988/CH0386) Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0018 (HB0199) Local Government Tort Claims Act - Cambridge Waterfront Development, Inc. Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0080 /CH0388 (HB0193/CH0387) Motor Vehicle Registration - Exceptions for Golf Carts - Hoopers Island and Taylors Island Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0342 (HB0556/CH0444) Caroline County and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0664 (HB1144) Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0988 /CH0386 (HB1456) Dorchester County - Orphans' Court - Salary and Expense Allowance of Orphans' Court Judges Senator Eckardt 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page