Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Dredging

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0343 /CH0807 (SB0020/CH0806)
Title
Environment - Dredged Material - Containment, Redeposit, and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444 (SB0339)
Title
Environment - Duck Nest Boxes - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886
Title
Confined Aquatic Disposal Task Force - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 /CH0558 (SB0969/CH0559)
Title
Watershed, Stream, and Floodplain Restoration - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Stream and Floodplain Restoration Funding (Whole Watershed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231 /CH0543 (SB0922/CH0544)
Title
Natural Resources - Fisheries - Oyster Management
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 /CH0806 (HB0343/CH0807)
Title
Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0249
Title
Environment - Membership and Duties of Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339 (HB0444)
Title
Environment - Duck Nest Boxes - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353
Title
Confined Aquatic Disposal Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0922 /CH0544 (HB1231/CH0543)
Title
Natural Resources – Fisheries – Oyster Management
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 /CH0559 (HB1165/CH0558)
Title
Watershed, Stream, and Floodplain Restoration - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Stream and Floodplain Restoration Funding (Whole Watershed Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0343 /CH0807 (SB0020/CH0806) Environment - Dredged Material - Containment, Redeposit, and Oversight Delegate Munoz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 807
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0352 (SB0362/CH0717) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
HB0444 (SB0339) Environment - Duck Nest Boxes - Wetlands License Requirements Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0886 Confined Aquatic Disposal Task Force - Established Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 /CH0558 (SB0969/CH0559) Watershed, Stream, and Floodplain Restoration - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Stream and Floodplain Restoration Funding (Whole Watershed Act) Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1231 /CH0543 (SB0922/CH0544) Natural Resources - Fisheries - Oyster Management Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0020 /CH0806 (HB0343/CH0807) Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Alterations Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 806
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/31/2024 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0249 Environment - Membership and Duties of Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Alterations Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/31/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0339 (HB0444) Environment - Duck Nest Boxes - Wetlands License Requirements Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0353 Confined Aquatic Disposal Task Force Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 /CH0717 (HB0352) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 717
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0922 /CH0544 (HB1231/CH0543) Natural Resources – Fisheries – Oyster Management Senator Mautz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0969 /CH0559 (HB1165/CH0558) Watershed, Stream, and Floodplain Restoration - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Stream and Floodplain Restoration Funding (Whole Watershed Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:39 PM
Click to return on the top page