Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Driver Education

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730 (SB0569)
Title
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driving in Right–Hand Lanes – Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0569 (HB0730)
Title
Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0730 (SB0569) Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals Speaker 3 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0964 Vehicle Laws – Driving in Right–Hand Lanes – Interstate Highways in Rural Areas Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/09/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0569 (HB0730) Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards - Applications and Renewals President 3 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0712 Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 2:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
SB0879 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:07 PM
Click to return on the top page