Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Drivers' Licenses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0335)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0750 (SB0422)
Title
Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver Education – Self–Paced, Online Instruction
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046 (SB0762)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078 /CH0511 (SB0788/CH0512)
Title
Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1121
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289
Title
Vehicle Laws - Learner's Instructional Permits and Identification Cards - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1293 (SB0884)
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension For Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296
Title
Motor Vehicles - Driver's License and Insurance Offenses - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1303
Title
Motor Vehicles - Emergency Commercial Driver's Licenses - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Boating Safety Notation
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0218 /CH0119
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0259)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0422 (HB0750)
Title
Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Consumer Protection – Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver’s Licenses – Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762 (HB1046)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0884 (HB1293)
Title
Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0259 (SB0335) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0750 (SB0422) Education - Jobs That Require Driving - Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 Vehicle Laws – Driver Education – Self–Paced, Online Instruction Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1046 (SB0762) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1078 /CH0511 (SB0788/CH0512) Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1121 Motor Vehicle Administration - Voluntary Developmental Disability Self-Disclosure Envelope Delegate Jones, R. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1289 Vehicle Laws - Learner's Instructional Permits and Identification Cards - Required Documents Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1293 (SB0884) Driver's Licenses - Suspension For Child Support Arrearages - Exception Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1296 Motor Vehicles - Driver's License and Insurance Offenses - Penalties Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1303 Motor Vehicles - Emergency Commercial Driver's Licenses - Establishment Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0084 Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses and Identification Cards - Boating Safety Notation Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0218 /CH0119 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0259) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0422 (HB0750) Education – Jobs That Require Driving – Requirements (Drivers Education for Good Jobs Act of 2022) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 Vehicle Laws - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0712 Consumer Protection – Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver’s Licenses – Prohibition Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0762 (HB1046) Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0884 (HB1293) Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception Senator Watson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:13 PM
Click to return on the top page