Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Drunk and Drugged Driving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 (SB0653)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0967 (SB0914)
Title
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1054 (SB0784)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants and Authorized Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0653 (HB0557)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1054)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0803 /CH0537
Title
Correctional Services - Drinking Driver Monitor Program - Position Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB0967)
Title
Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0557 (SB0653) Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0967 (SB0914) Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1054 (SB0784) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1158 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants and Authorized Police Officers Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0653 (HB0557) Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 Vehicle Laws - Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0784 (HB1054) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0803 /CH0537 Correctional Services - Drinking Driver Monitor Program - Position Requirement Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 537
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
4/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0914 (HB0967) Grossly Negligent or Drunk or Drugged Operation of Vehicle or Vessel – Penalties and Prior Convictions Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:12 PM
Click to return on the top page