Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Drunk and Drugged Driving

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105 (SB0421)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683 (SB0087)
Title
Homicide or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Parole Eligibility and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0770 (SB0740)
Title
Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schmidt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867 (SB0118)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement and Shielding - Probation Before Judgment for Driving While Impaired or Under the Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392 (SB1037)
Title
Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence
Sponsor
Delegate Tomlinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Points Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Roberson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1439
Title
Emergency Services - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 (HB0683)
Title
Homicide or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Parole Eligibility and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0118 (HB0867)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses - Expungement and the Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 (HB0105)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0740 (HB0770)
Title
Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Gile
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037 (HB1392)
Title
Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Emergency Services - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 (SB0421) Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0683 (SB0087) Homicide or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Parole Eligibility and Penalties Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2024 - 1:30 PM
HB0770 (SB0740) Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law) Delegate Schmidt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0867 (SB0118) Criminal Procedure - Expungement and Shielding - Probation Before Judgment for Driving While Impaired or Under the Influence Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 (SB1037) Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence Delegate Tomlinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1406 Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Points Assessments Delegate Roberson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1439 Emergency Services - Funding Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
2/28/2024 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0087 (HB0683) Homicide or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Parole Eligibility and Penalties Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0118 (HB0867) Drunk Driving Offenses - Expungement and the Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (113-24)
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0421 (HB0105) Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0740 (HB0770) Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law) Senator Gile 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1037 (HB1392) Courts - Impaired Operation of Vehicle or Vessel - Expert Witnesses and Evidence Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Emergency Services - Funding Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 5:02 PM
Click to return on the top page