Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Easements

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Natural Resources - Removal of Trees or Shrubs - Notice and Objection
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 (SB0576)
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0429 (SB0043)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Arbitration
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 /CH0684 (SB0693)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0766)
Title
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 /CH0558 (SB0969/CH0559)
Title
Watershed, Stream, and Floodplain Restoration - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Stream and Floodplain Restoration Funding (Whole Watershed Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1196 (SB0962)
Title
Real Property - Contracts of Sale - Title Report Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250 (SB0936)
Title
Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB1082)
Title
Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Ziegler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1511 /CH0457
Title
Forest Conservation Act – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043 (HB0429)
Title
Maryland Historical Trust - Arbitration
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB0248)
Title
Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0796/CH0684)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1007)
Title
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936 (HB1250)
Title
Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0962 (HB1196)
Title
Real Property – Contracts of Sale – Title Report Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1082 (HB1328)
Title
Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0219 Natural Resources - Removal of Trees or Shrubs - Notice and Objection Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0248 (SB0576) Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0429 (SB0043) Maryland Historical Trust - Arbitration Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB0796 /CH0684 (SB0693) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1007 (SB0766) Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 /CH0558 (SB0969/CH0559) Watershed, Stream, and Floodplain Restoration - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Restoration and Stream and Floodplain Restoration Funding (Whole Watershed Act) Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1196 (SB0962) Real Property - Contracts of Sale - Title Report Requirement Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1250 (SB0936) Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1328 (SB1082) Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement Delegate Ziegler 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1511 /CH0457 Forest Conservation Act – Modifications Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2024 - 3:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0043 (HB0429) Maryland Historical Trust - Arbitration Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB0248) Property Tax - Assessment Appeal Boards and Supervisors - Regional Organization Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0693 (HB0796/CH0684) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1007) Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0936 (HB1250) Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0962 (HB1196) Real Property – Contracts of Sale – Title Report Requirement Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1082 (HB1328) Solar Energy and Energy Storage - Development and State Procurement Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/15/2024 2:42 PM
Click to return on the top page