Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Elder Abuse and Neglect -see also- Vulnerable Adults

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 /CH0227
Title
Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 Criminal Law - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adult or Elderly Individual - Undue Influence Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 /CH0227 Fiduciary Institutions - Investigation of Financial Abuse and Financial Exploitation - Records Disclosure Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:33 AM
Click to return on the top page