Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Electricians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208 /CH0052 (SB0163/CH0051)
Title
St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0254
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Electricians - Local Licenses - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 /CH0051 (HB0208/CH0052)
Title
St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0208 /CH0052 (SB0163/CH0051) St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0246 /CH0254 Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and Fees Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 Electricians - Local Licenses - Repeal Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1470 Apprenticeship and Training Council - Apprentice Ratios - Electrical Craft or Trade Delegate McCray 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 /CH0051 (HB0208/CH0052) St. Mary's County - Electricians and Board of Electrical Examiners - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:40 PM
Click to return on the top page