Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Environmental Service, Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0002 (SB0002/CH0072)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164 /CH0289 (SB0116/CH0290)
Title
Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0650)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 /CH0072 (HB0002)
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0290 (HB0164/CH0289)
Title
Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650 (HB1094)
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0002 (SB0002/CH0072) Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021 Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0164 /CH0289 (SB0116/CH0290) Department of the Environment – Office of Recycling – Recycling Market Development Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1094 (SB0650) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0002 /CH0072 (HB0002) Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021 Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
Environment and Transportation
SB0116 /CH0290 (HB0164/CH0289) Department of the Environment - Office of Recycling - Recycling Market Development Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
SB0650 (HB1094) Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility Senator Klausmeier 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Comprehensive Conservation Finance Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) and Hearing canceled (Appropriations)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page