Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Essential Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1199 (SB0813)
Title
Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0047 (HB0806)
Title
Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 /CH0351 (HB0595)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813 (HB1199)
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0962 Washington County - Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs - Essential Caregivers Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1199 (SB0813) Workers’ Compensation – Occupational Disease Presumptions – COVID–19 Delegate Valderrama 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0047 (HB0806) Health Facilities – Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Programs – Essential Caregivers Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0726 /CH0351 (HB0595) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0813 (HB1199) Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumptions - COVID-19 Senator Klausmeier 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:19 AM
Click to return on the top page