Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Examinations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 (SB0008)
Title
Mental Health - Treatment Plans for Individuals in Facilities and Residence Grievance System
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0132 (SB0023)
Title
Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2023)
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895 (SB0444)
Title
State Board of Electricians - Limited Energy Contractors and Limited Energy Integrators - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Faith–Based and Religious Beliefs – Academic Accommodations Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 (SB0662)
Title
Higher Education - Appointment of Secretary and Student Financial Assistance - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - University of Maryland School of Dentistry Faculty - Qualifying for Examination
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 (SB0121)
Title
More Opportunities for Career-Focused Students Act of 2023
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0008 (HB0121)
Title
Mental Health – Treatment Plans for Individuals in Facilities – Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 (HB0132)
Title
Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0121 (HB1247)
Title
More Opportunities for Career–Focused Students Act of 2023
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271
Title
Education - Maryland Civic Excellence Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0338
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Extended School Year Innovation Grant
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423
Title
State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing - Eyelash Extensions
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0444 (HB0895)
Title
State Board of Electricians - Limited Energy Contractors and Limited Energy Integrators - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB0923)
Title
Higher Education - Appointment of Secretary and Student Financial Assistance - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675
Title
Howard County and St. Mary's County - Driver's Licenses - Driver Skills Examinations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 (SB0008) Mental Health - Treatment Plans for Individuals in Facilities and Residence Grievance System Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2023 - 3:00 PM
Finance
HB0132 (SB0023) Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Economic Matters
2/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0737 Alternative Education Options - Right to Learn and Broadening Options and Opportunities for Students Today Programs (Right to Learn Act of 2023) Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0895 (SB0444) State Board of Electricians - Limited Energy Contractors and Limited Energy Integrators - Licensing Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0912 Public Institutions of Higher Education – Faith–Based and Religious Beliefs – Academic Accommodations Policy Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0923 (SB0662) Higher Education - Appointment of Secretary and Student Financial Assistance - Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Appropriations
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1159 State Board of Dental Examiners - University of Maryland School of Dentistry Faculty - Qualifying for Examination Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1247 (SB0121) More Opportunities for Career-Focused Students Act of 2023 Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0008 (HB0121) Mental Health – Treatment Plans for Individuals in Facilities – Requirements Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/31/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0023 (HB0132) Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services - Journeyman License - Qualifications Senator Brooks 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/26/2023 - 3:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0121 (HB1247) More Opportunities for Career–Focused Students Act of 2023 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
1/24/2023 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0271 Education - Maryland Civic Excellence Program - Established Senator Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0338 Primary and Secondary Education - Extended School Year Innovation Grant Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Budget and Taxation
SB0423 State Board of Cosmetologists - Licensing - Eyelash Extensions Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0444 (HB0895) State Board of Electricians - Limited Energy Contractors and Limited Energy Integrators - Licensing Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0662 (HB0923) Higher Education - Appointment of Secretary and Student Financial Assistance - Alterations Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 Howard County and St. Mary's County - Driver's Licenses - Driver Skills Examinations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/23/2023 10:03 AM
Click to return on the top page