Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 /CH0071 (SB0109/CH0070)
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 (SB0871)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1391 /CH0234
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0109 /CH0070 (HB0497/CH0071)
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1259)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Alteration Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0497 /CH0071 (SB0109/CH0070) Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Ways and Means
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1259 (SB0871) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1391 /CH0234 Clean Cars Act of 2022 Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0109 /CH0070 (HB0497/CH0071) Vehicle Excise Tax - Exemption - Active Duty Military Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Budget and Taxation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0871 (HB1259) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 4:51 PM
Click to return on the top page