Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Excise Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
Vehicle Excise Tax - Rate Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Fair
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0387
Title
Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 (SB0814)
Title
Local Government - Development Impact Fees, Surcharges, and Excise Taxes - Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898
Title
Transportation - Vehicle Excise Tax - Rental Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Local Government - Excise Tax on Plastic and Paper Carryout Bags
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 (SB0582)
Title
Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1466 (SB0891)
Title
Land Use and Real Property - Accessory Dwelling Units - Requirements and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510
Title
Excess Ownership of Single-Family Residences Excise Tax (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB1428)
Title
Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 (HB0698)
Title
Local Government - Development Impact Fees, Surcharges, and Excise Taxes - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 (HB1466)
Title
Land Use and Real Property - Accessory Dwelling Units - Requirements and Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 Vehicle Excise Tax - Rate Increase Delegate Fair 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0387 Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 (SB0814) Local Government - Development Impact Fees, Surcharges, and Excise Taxes - Reporting Delegate Allen 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0898 Transportation - Vehicle Excise Tax - Rental Vehicles Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Local Government - Excise Tax on Plastic and Paper Carryout Bags Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1428 (SB0582) Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1466 (SB0891) Land Use and Real Property - Accessory Dwelling Units - Requirements and Prohibitions Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0510 Excess Ownership of Single-Family Residences Excise Tax (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025) Senator Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0582 (HB1428) Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025) Senator Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0814 (HB0698) Local Government - Development Impact Fees, Surcharges, and Excise Taxes - Reporting Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 (HB1466) Land Use and Real Property - Accessory Dwelling Units - Requirements and Prohibitions Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page