Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Explosives -see also- Fireworks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0121 /CH0612 (SB0287)
Title
Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - Venue
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0822 /CH0633
Title
Criminal Law - Altering References From Mentally Defective to Substantially Cognitively Impaired Individual
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0013
Title
Public Safety - Department of State Police - Transfer of Surplus Military Property
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 (HB0121/CH0612)
Title
Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - Venue
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0121 /CH0612 (SB0287) Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - Venue Delegate Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Judiciary
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0822 /CH0633 Criminal Law - Altering References From Mentally Defective to Substantially Cognitively Impaired Individual Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 633
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0013 Public Safety - Department of State Police - Transfer of Surplus Military Property Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0287 (HB0121/CH0612) Criminal Law - False Statement Concerning Destructive Device or Toxic Material - Venue Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM
Click to return on the top page