Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122 (SB0138)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 (SB0022)
Title
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 (SB0357/CH0190)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Felony Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0441)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0960)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Hunting Offenses - Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1442 (SB0710)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Mistaken Identity
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0209)
Title
Criminal Law - Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0138 (HB0122)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357 /CH0190 (HB0589)
Title
Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 (HB0991)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 (HB1442)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0767
Title
Criminal Procedure - Human Trafficking - Vacatur and Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 (HB1298)
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing Offenses - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0122 (SB0138) Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Expansion Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0209 (SB0022) Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice – Repeal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0589 (SB0357/CH0190) Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0957 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Felony Convictions Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 (SB0441) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board and Police Accountability Board Delegate Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1298 (SB0960) Criminal Procedure - Hunting Offenses - Expungement Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Equity Act) Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1442 (SB0710) Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Modifications Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0016 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Mistaken Identity Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0022 (HB0209) Criminal Law - Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0026 Automatic Expungement - Clarification Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (109-21)
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0138 (HB0122) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Expansion Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0356 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0357 /CH0190 (HB0589) Adult Protective Services - Workgroup to Study Best Practices for a Vulnerable Adult Registry in Maryland Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0441 (HB0991) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0710 (HB1442) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Modifications Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0767 Criminal Procedure - Human Trafficking - Vacatur and Expungement Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0960 (HB1298) Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing Offenses - Expungement Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:21 AM
Click to return on the top page