Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Expungement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0037)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 (SB0173)
Title
Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0505)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Convictions
Sponsor
Delegate Alston
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0017)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Good Cause
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0746 (SB0544)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Period
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Expunged Conviction
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0906
Title
Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Prohibited Disclosures and Predetermination Review Process
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1175
Title
Criminal Procedure - Hunting Offenses - Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Valentine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0017 (HB0664)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Good Cause
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0097)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods (REDEEM Act of 2023)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0066
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Mistaken Identity
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088
Title
Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement - Pardoned Conviction of Possession of Cannabis (Pardons for Simple Possession of Cannabis Act of 2023)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0173 (HB0189)
Title
Automatic Expungement - Clarification
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 (HB0660)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Convictions
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB0746)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Waiting Period
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 (SB0037) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0189 (SB0173) Automatic Expungement - Clarification Delegate Moon 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0660 (SB0505) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Convictions Delegate Alston 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0664 (SB0017) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Good Cause Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0746 (SB0544) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Period Delegate Wells 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 Public Safety – Handgun Permits – Expunged Conviction Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0854 Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Revisions Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB0906 Occupational Licensing and Certification - Criminal History - Prohibited Disclosures and Predetermination Review Process Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
HB1175 Criminal Procedure - Hunting Offenses - Expungement Delegate Valentine 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0017 (HB0664) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Good Cause Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Judicial Proceedings
SB0037 (HB0097) Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Waiting Periods (REDEEM Act of 2023) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0066 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Mistaken Identity Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0088 Criminal Procedure - Automatic Expungement - Pardoned Conviction of Possession of Cannabis (Pardons for Simple Possession of Cannabis Act of 2023) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0173 (HB0189) Automatic Expungement - Clarification Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2023 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/22/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0505 (HB0660) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Convictions Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0544 (HB0746) Criminal Procedure – Expungement of Records – Waiting Period Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/20/2023 3:57 PM
Click to return on the top page