Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0258
Title
Community Colleges - Minority Business Enterprise Programs - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Bachelor's Degree Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 /CH0647
Title
Task Force to Study a Promise Scholarship Program in Prince George's County PG 438-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0258 Community Colleges - Minority Business Enterprise Programs - Establishment Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Bachelor's Degree Programs Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 /CH0647 Task Force to Study a Promise Scholarship Program in Prince George's County PG 438-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page