Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0504)
Title
Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB0478)
Title
Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0813
Title
Howard Community College - Board of Trustees, Meetings, and Contracts - Alterations Ho. Co. 1-25
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0478 (SB0504) Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0504 (HB0478) Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
SB0813 Howard Community College - Board of Trustees, Meetings, and Contracts - Alterations Ho. Co. 1-25 Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2025 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/8/2025 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page