Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Facsimile Transmission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 (SB0343)
Title
Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1109 /CH0107
Title
Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0343 (HB0447)
Title
Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and Study
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0447 (SB0343) Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and Study Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1109 /CH0107 Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Procedures Delegate Swain 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0343 (HB0447) Wireless Landline Telephone Service - Prohibition and Study Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page