Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Fairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0024)
Title
Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
Sponsor
Delegate Mangione
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 /CH0167 (SB0919/CH0168)
Title
Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 (HB0897)
Title
Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 /CH0168 (HB1259/CH0167)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0897 (SB0024) Gaming - Sports and Event Wagering License - Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc. Delegate Mangione 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB1232 /CH0360 (SB0821/CH0359) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Delegate Brooks 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1259 /CH0167 (SB0919/CH0168) Horse Racing – Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0024 (HB0897) Gaming – Sports and Event Wagering License – Maryland State Fair and Agricultural Society, Inc. Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0821 /CH0359 (HB1232/CH0360) Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses and Off-Site Permits Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0919 /CH0168 (HB1259/CH0167) Horse Racing - Fair Hill Natural Resources Management Area Senator Gallion 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:31 PM
Click to return on the top page