Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029)
Title
Family Law - Marriage of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104 (SB0041)
Title
Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Maryland Parental Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0943
Title
Family Law - Grandparent Visitation
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Human Services - Commission on Fatherhood (Fatherhood Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 (SB0336)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175)
Title
Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0104)
Title
Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB1407)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 /CH0175 (SB0029) Family Law - Marriage of Minors Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0104 (SB0041) Family Law - Child Custody and Visitation Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0618 Maryland Parental Rights Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0639 Family Law - Grounds for Divorce Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0943 Family Law - Grandparent Visitation Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1213 Human Services - Commission on Fatherhood (Fatherhood Protection Act) Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1407 (SB0336) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0029 (HB0083/CH0175) Family Law - Marriage - Age Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0041 (HB0104) Family Law – Child Custody and Visitation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0336 (HB1407) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:12 AM
Click to return on the top page