Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Fiduciaries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0437 (SB0753)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0859 /CH0646
Title
Interests in Grantor and Qualified Terminable Interest Property Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0753 (HB0437)
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0437 (SB0753) Maryland Trust Act Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0859 /CH0646 Interests in Grantor and Qualified Terminable Interest Property Trusts Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0753 (HB0437) Maryland Trust Act Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM
Click to return on the top page