Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Financial Regulation, Division of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642
Title
Consumer Protection – Maryland Consumer Reporting Act – Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004
Title
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Credit Union Power
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0219 /CH0100
Title
Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238
Title
Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0102
Title
Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933
Title
Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0642 Consumer Protection – Maryland Consumer Reporting Act – Regulations Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1004 Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Credit Union Power Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0219 /CH0100 Financial Institutions – Commissioner of Financial Regulation – Money Transmissions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Finance
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0238 Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0102 Office of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Sunset Extension Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 102
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0933 Financial Regulation - Access to Banking and Financial Services - Reporting Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page