Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Fingerprinting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0335)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 (SB0165)
Title
Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0728 (SB0371/CH0276)
Title
Carroll County – Prospective Employees and Volunteers – Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Biometric Authentication Requirements for Governmental Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0165 (HB0294)
Title
Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0335 (HB0259)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728)
Title
Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389
Title
Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546
Title
Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0259 (SB0335) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Data Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0294 (SB0165) Juvenile Court - Jurisdiction Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0728 (SB0371/CH0276) Carroll County – Prospective Employees and Volunteers – Criminal History Records Check Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Rules
HB1463 Biometric Authentication Requirements for Governmental Services - Prohibition Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0165 (HB0294) Juvenile Court – Jurisdiction Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0335 (HB0259) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers Privacy Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0371 /CH0276 (HB0728) Carroll County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records Check Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0389 Public Safety - Maryland Police Accountability Act Revisions and Clarifications Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/08/2022 - 9:00 AM
SB0546 Vehicle Equipment – Transfer of Catalytic Converter – Regulation Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:43 AM
Click to return on the top page